NH HB311 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating sober living facilities.
Title
Regulating sober living facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2824h (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-30 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2019-2824h: 11/05/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/05/2019 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-08-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-06-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Municipal and County Government 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0152h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0152h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0152h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 7 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-23 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 45 |
Same As/Similar To
HB311 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate