NH HB312 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 82; Eff: 06/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study tiny houses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study tiny houses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 82; Eff: 06/18/2019
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-14HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1882e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100
2019-05-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1882e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-03SenateHearing: 04/10/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0726h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 15
2019-03-20HouseAmendment # 2019-0726h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 15
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0726h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 30
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback