NH HB319 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 239; I. Sec. 1 eff. 9/16/2017 ; II. Sec. 3 eff. 7/1/2017 ; III. Rem. eff. 7/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 239; I. Sec. 1 eff. 9/16/2017 ; II. Sec. 3 eff. 7/1/2017 ; III. Rem. eff. 7/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting 20-day registration plates, relative to the suspension of a driver's license, and relative to salvage certificates of titles for motor vehicles.
Title
Limiting 20-day registration plates, relative to the suspension of a driver's license, and relative to salvage certificates of titles for motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 239; I. Sec. 1 eff. 9/16/2017 ; II. Sec. 3 eff. 7/1/2017 ; III. Rem. eff. 7/18/2017 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2311c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2311c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2311c; 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/13/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Ward, Watters; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Steven Smith, T. Walsh, Horn, Sykes 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 4 |
2017-06-01 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1318s and Requests CofC (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 4 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1318s, Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1318s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1318s, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0622h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 47 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0622h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 47 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0622h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar) |
2017-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 8 |