NH HB324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 52; Eff: 06/05/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 52; Eff: 06/05/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to operation of personal water craft around the marsh lands or flats in the Hampton/Seabrook estuary.
Title
Relative to operation of personal water craft around the marsh lands or flats in the Hampton/Seabrook estuary.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. William Fowler [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Rep. Michael Edgar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 52; Eff: 06/05/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0454h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 31 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0454h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 31 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0454h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12 |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 45 |