NH HB328 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 53; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 53; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the New Hampshire film and television commission.
Title
Repealing the New Hampshire film and television commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 53; Eff: 08/04/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 12 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 6 |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building306 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 45 |