NH HB335 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 165; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 165; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to therapeutic cannabis dispensary locations.
Title
Relative to therapeutic cannabis dispensary locations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 165; Eff: 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 16 |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 10 |
2019-01-31 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 45 |