NH HB347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 103; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 103; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adding insurer's policy administration expenses to commercial rate standards.
Title
Adding insurer's policy administration expenses to commercial rate standards.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 103; Eff: 08/20/2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/25/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-01-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 4 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2019-01-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 46 |