NH HB350 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 104; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 104; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensed health care providers authorized to certify that criteria has been met for the use of therapeutic cannabis.
Title
Relative to licensed health care providers authorized to certify that criteria has been met for the use of therapeutic cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 104; Eff: 08/20/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1464s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 2 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1464s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1464s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1464s, 04/18/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0314h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 16 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0314h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 16 |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0314h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 10 |
2019-01-31 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 46 |