NH HB354 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 129; Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 129; Eff: 06/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to investigate whether modification should be made to the time frame for determining permanency pursuant to RSA 169-C:24-b.
Title
Establishing a committee to investigate whether modification should be made to the time frame for determining permanency pursuant to RSA 169-C:24-b.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 129; Eff: 06/25/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1992e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1992e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1623s (Rep. Long): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 2 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1623s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1623s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1623s, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:35 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0172h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0172h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0172h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 13 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 46 |