NH HB371 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB371
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding cats to the definition of commercial kennel.
Title
Adding cats to the definition of commercial kennel.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Flanagan [R] | Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2744h (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-26 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB371 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate