NH HB377 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB377
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the best interests of the child under the child protection act.
Title
Relative to the best interests of the child under the child protection act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-10-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2815h (Vote 14-1; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/09/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-08-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-03-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB377 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate