NH HB382 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Law Without Signature 06/08/2019; Chapter 71; 08/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Law Without Signature 06/08/2019; Chapter 71; 08/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to private practice by the Carroll county attorney.
Title
Relative to private practice by the Carroll county attorney.
Sponsors
Rep. Edith DesMarais [D] | Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] |
Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Harrison Kanzler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Law Without Signature 06/08/2019; Chapter 71; 08/07/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:50 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 188-140 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 58 |
2019-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 16 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 12 |