NH HB383 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-24 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0339h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-24 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0339h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the collection of certain agency fees from state employees who are not members of the state employees' association.
Title
Prohibiting the collection of certain agency fees from state employees who are not members of the state employees' association.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-24 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0339h | |
2011-10-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0339h for Jan 4 (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar) | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/11/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-01 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2011 2:20 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Executive Departments & Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 184 |