NH HB384 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB384
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to historic burial sites on state-owned land.
Title
Relative to access to historic burial sites on state-owned land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0445h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 21 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0445h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 21 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0445h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 13 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB384 (Carry Over) 2019-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar