NH HB393 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 326; I. Sec. 10 & 11 Eff: as provided in Sec.12 II. Sec. 9 Eff: 07/01/2019 at 12:01am III. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 326; I. Sec. 10 & 11 Eff: as provided in Sec.12 II. Sec. 9 Eff: 07/01/2019 at 12:01am III. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study child care in New Hampshire, relative to tuition waivers for children in state foster care or guardianship, relative to penalties for violations related to obtaining public assistance, relative to designated receiving facilities, relative to the membership of the commission to study the environmental and health effects of evolving 5G technology, and relative to the moratorium on health facility licensure.
Title
Establishing a committee to study child care in New Hampshire, relative to tuition waivers for children in state foster care or guardianship, relative to penalties for violations related to obtaining public assistance, relative to designated receiving facilities, relative to the membership of the commission to study the environmental and health effects of evolving 5G technology, and relative to the moratorium on health facility licensure.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Sherry Frost [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] | Rep. Tom Loughman [D] |
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Werner Horn [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 326; I. Sec. 10 & 11 Eff: as provided in Sec.12 II. Sec. 9 Eff: 07/01/2019 at 12:01am III. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019 |
2019-07-29 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 59 |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2658e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2658e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2546c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2546c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 32 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2546c; 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-17 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Camarota Replaces Rep. Jurius 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 20 |
2019-06-14 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sherman, Chandley, Bradley; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Long, Berrien, Diggs, Jurius 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 43 |
2019-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2437s and 2456s and Requests CofC (Rep. Long): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 43 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-2437s and 2019-2456s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-2456s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-2437s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2352s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Special Order to the end of Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 06/06/2019; Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2352s, 06/06/2019; Senate Calendar 25 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2352s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm, on proposed amendment # 2019-1485s; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1023h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-1023h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1023h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-31 | House | Vacated and Referred to Children and Family Law (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 12 |