NH HB396 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study requiring safety training or instruction prior to the purchase or acquisition of a firearm.
Title
Establishing a committee to study requiring safety training or instruction prior to the purchase or acquisition of a firearm.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.751 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.502 |
2013-02-27 | House | If needed, Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 2:00 PM Representatives Hall |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.194 |