NH HB402 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 57; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 57; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to required notice of mortgage funding at a construction jobsite.
Title
Relative to required notice of mortgage funding at a construction jobsite.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 57; Eff: 08/04/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 4 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 3 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 13 |