NH HB415 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 131; Eff: 08/24/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 131; Eff: 08/24/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the official ballot referendum form of town meetings.
Title
Relative to the official ballot referendum form of town meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2019; Chapter 131; Eff: 08/24/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 235-122 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 16 |
2019-03-14 | House | Special Order to 03/19/2019 Without Objection House Journal 9 P. 51 |
2019-03-14 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Warden) 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 1 |
2019-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 5 |
2019-02-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 13 |