NH HB419 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a deferred retirement option in the judicial retirement plan.
Title
Establishing a deferred retirement option in the judicial retirement plan.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hikel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-10-15 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-08-27 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-05-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2013 8:32 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.195 |