NH HB421 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB421
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to revocation of retirement and other benefits for persons convicted of certain crimes while in public service.
Title
Relative to revocation of retirement and other benefits for persons convicted of certain crimes while in public service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 64 |
2017-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-09-11 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-08-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/24/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB421 (Carry Over) 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar)