NH HB427 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 109; Eff: 06/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 109; Eff: 06/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the procedure for filing a protective order on behalf of a minor.
Title
Relative to the procedure for filing a protective order on behalf of a minor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 109; Eff: 06/21/2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1038h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-1038h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1038h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2019-03-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-02-27 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 14 |