NH HB432 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB432
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to automobile insurance reimbursement rates.
Title
Relative to automobile insurance reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Rep. Kermit Williams [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Dennis Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2019-09-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-08-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB432 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)