NH HB441 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB441
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/11/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98842942608 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/11/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98842942608 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disclosure of the source of legislative bill proposals and the disclosure of certain information by lobbyists.
Title
Relative to disclosure of the source of legislative bill proposals and the disclosure of certain information by lobbyists.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Timothy Smith [D] | Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] |
Rep. Mark King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/11/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98842942608 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-01-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 51 |
2019-10-24 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 13 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB441 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar)