NH HB444 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to penalties for passing a school bus for the third or subsequent offense.
Title
Relative to penalties for passing a school bus for the third or subsequent offense.
Sponsors
Rep. John Janigian [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] |
Rep. Betty Gay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6 |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 14 |