NH HB445 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of electronic tracking devices.
Title
Relative to the regulation of electronic tracking devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-26 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 10/25/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 10/18/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-06-22 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 9/27/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce & Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG.186 |