NH HB446 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the amount of the optional property tax credit for service-connected total disability.
Title
Relative to the amount of the optional property tax credit for service-connected total disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.467 |
2013-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 20 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.267 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.196 |