NH HB446 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to investigational drugs, biological products, and devices.
Title
Relative to access to investigational drugs, biological products, and devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Wright [R] | Rep. Warren Groen [R] | Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Rep. Catherine Cheney [R] |
Rep. Peter Hansen [R] | Rep. Leon Rideout [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Wright): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1221-1222 |
2015-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 10-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 428 |
2015-02-25 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED== |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 224 |