NH HB446 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state construction contracts.
Title
Relative to state construction contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 12 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10 |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 13 |