NH HB446 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 230-148 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 230-148 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.
Title
Relative to initiating amendments and corrections to birth records.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Lisa Bunker [D] |
Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Garrett Muscatel [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 230 N: 148 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 224 N: 125 NV: 12 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 224 N: 125 NV: 12 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 230-148 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 33 |
2019-07-24 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1854s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 9 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1854s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1854s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1854s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0801h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 224-125 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 11 |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0801h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 11 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0801h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7 |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-27 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 02:00 pm Reps Hall |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 14 |