NH HB447 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school calendar days.
Title
Relative to school calendar days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 17 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 7 |
2019-02-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB447 (Carry Over) 2019-11-06 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate