NH HB453 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed By Governor 06/28/2013; Effective 08/27/2013; Chapter 0150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed By Governor 06/28/2013; Effective 08/27/2013; Chapter 0150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the prospective repeal of the information and analysis center.
Title
Repealing the prospective repeal of the information and analysis center.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Signed By Governor 06/28/2013; Effective 08/27/2013; Chapter 0150 |
2013-06-13 | House | Enrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1648 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 4/24/13, Room 100, State House, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.772-773 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.514-515 |
2013-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 13 (Vote 14-5; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.514-515 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 1/30/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.196 |