NH HB453 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special number plates for circuit court judges.
Title
Relative to special number plates for circuit court judges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 569 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 353 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 224 |