NH HB453 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 03/22/2019; Chapter 1; Eff: 03/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 03/22/2019; Chapter 1; Eff: 03/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making changes to the membership of the state house bicentennial commission, declaring June 2 - June 8 as New Hampshire State House Bicentennial Week, and declaring June 6 as New Hampshire Legislators' Homecoming Day.
Title
Making changes to the membership of the state house bicentennial commission, declaring June 2 - June 8 as New Hampshire State House Bicentennial Week, and declaring June 6 as New Hampshire Legislators' Homecoming Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 03/22/2019; Chapter 1; Eff: 03/22/2019 |
2019-03-15 | House | Enrolled 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 52 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 03/14/2019); Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced 02/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0080 (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 18 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0080h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 18 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0080h (NT) for 02/14/2019 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 9 |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 14 |