NH HB457 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1660s (Rep. Wall): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the making, preservation, and Internet availability of audio and video recordings of proceedings of committees of the house of representatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the making, preservation, and Internet availability of audio and video recordings of proceedings of committees of the house of representatives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1660s (Rep. Wall): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1660s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1660s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1660s, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-16SenateHearing: 04/24/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 220-147 04/04/2019
2019-03-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/04/2019 (Vote 14-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 5
2019-03-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-14HouseFinance Division I Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 19
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0599h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 19
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0599h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 19
2019-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0599h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 12
2019-02-13House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-06House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback