NH HB466 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB466
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 199-139 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 199-139 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the capacity of electricity customer generators for eligibility for net energy metering.
Title
Relative to the capacity of electricity customer generators for eligibility for net energy metering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 199 N: 139 NV: 17 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 199-139 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote |
2020-07-22 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-120 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 60 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2876s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2876s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2876s, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24A |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 231-121 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 30 |
2019-03-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 33 |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-01-16 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 15 |
Same As/Similar To
HB466 (Carry Over) 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2876s