NH HB468 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 214; Eff: 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 214; Eff: 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the inclusion of attendance stipends and certain additional pay for instructional activities as earnable compensation in the retirement system.
Title
Relative to the inclusion of attendance stipends and certain additional pay for instructional activities as earnable compensation in the retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 214; Eff: 09/10/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2040s (Rep. Goley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 4 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2040s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2040s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2040s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0888h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 24 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0888h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 24 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0888h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 9 |
2019-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 15 |