NH HB471 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 220-121 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 220-121 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to indicating citizenship on drivers' licenses and nondrivers identification cards.
Title
Relative to indicating citizenship on drivers' licenses and nondrivers identification cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Gay [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - ITL (Y: 220 N: 121 NV: 30 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 220-121 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 56 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 37 |
2019-02-27 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2019-02-20 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 15 |