NH HB476 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/07/2019; Chapter 319; Eff: 08/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/07/2019; Chapter 319; Eff: 08/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replacing the milk producers emergency relief fund with the dairy premium fund.
Title
Replacing the milk producers emergency relief fund with the dairy premium fund.
Sponsors
Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/07/2019; Chapter 319; Eff: 08/07/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1886s and 1949s (Rep. Gourgue): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1886s and 2019-1949s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment # 2019-1949s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1886s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1886s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0443h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 59 |
2019-02-28 | House | Amendment # 2019-0443h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 59 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0443h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 29 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-30 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 15 |