NH HB478 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB478
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2810h (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2810h (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Norman Major [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Janet Wall [D] | Rep. Susan Almy [D] |
Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2810h (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-10-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-10-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/16/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-09-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/17/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-08-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/04/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-08-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/04/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB478 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2810h (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar)