NH HB482 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB482
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the revenue stabilization reserve account.
Title
Relative to the revenue stabilization reserve account.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Almy [D] | Rep. William Hatch [D] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. Dennis Malloy [D] |
Rep. Thomas Southworth [D] | Rep. Joelle Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/09/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-31 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB482 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)