NH HB483 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB483
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting the psychology interjurisdictional compact (PSYPACT).
Title
Adopting the psychology interjurisdictional compact (PSYPACT).
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 48 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 11 |
2019-10-22 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-23 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB483 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)