NH HB486 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB486
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the protection of wetlands.
Title
Relative to the protection of wetlands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305 |
2018-09-12 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-09-05 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 40 |
2017-11-09 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-09-28 | House | Executive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-09-13 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-08-31 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/13/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/22/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/15/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 15 |
Same As/Similar To
HB486 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)