NH HB492 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to rates for parking meters.
Title
Relative to rates for parking meters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 59 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 17 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 17 |