NH HB494 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 328; Eff: 08/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to removal or containment of contaminants from the Coakley Landfill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to removal or containment of contaminants from the Coakley Landfill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - OTP (Y: 230 N: 98 NV: 38 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Table (Y: 123 N: 206 NV: 37 Abs: 34) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 328; Eff: 08/16/2019
2019-07-29HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2664e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-07-09SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2664e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2615c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2615c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-20SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2615c; 06/27/2019
2019-06-14HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/19/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-06-11SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Fuller Clark, Sherman, Giuda; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-11SenateSen. Fuller Clark Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Bixby, Beaulieu, Andrew Bouldin, Cushing 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 41
2019-06-10HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2334s and Requests CofC (Rep. Gourgue): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 41
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2334s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2334s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2334s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-04-10SenateHearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 231-97 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 107
2019-03-19HouseLay on Table (Rep. Spang): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 123-206 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 107
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0732h: Amendment Failed DV 107-203 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 107
2019-03-11HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-11HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0732h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 25
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback