NH HB495 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 329; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2029 II. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission on drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission on drinking water.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 329; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2029 II. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019
2019-07-29HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 59
2019-07-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2633e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 55
2019-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2633e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2353s (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 11
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2353s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2353s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2353s, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-04-10SenateHearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, State House, 08:30 am; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0697h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 31
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0697h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 31
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0697h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12
2019-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback