NH HB506 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB506
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to allowing employees time to vote in biennial general elections
Title
Relative to allowing employees time to vote in biennial general elections
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Timothy Smith [D] | Rep. William Pearson [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] |
Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] | Rep. Mark King [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 186 N: 173 NV: 19 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2854h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 211-148 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 110 |
2020-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2019-2854h (NT): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 186-173 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 110 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2854h (NT) (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 23 |
2019-10-23 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-09-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-08-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/04/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 17 |
Same As/Similar To
HB506 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2854h (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar)