NH HB508 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 330; I. Sec. 1-4 Eff: 10/15/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 330; I. Sec. 1-4 Eff: 10/15/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to direct primary care.
Title
Relative to direct primary care.
Sponsors
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
Rep. Josh Yokela [R] | Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 330; I. Sec. 1-4 Eff: 10/15/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 08/16/2019 |
2019-07-29 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 59 |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2659e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2659e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2586c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2586c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 32 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2586c; 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-13 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sherman, Fuller Clark, Gray; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Butler, Indruk, Marsh, Campion 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 44 |
2019-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1863s and Requests CofC (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 44 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1863s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1863s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1863s, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1184h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 2 |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendment # 2019-1184h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 2 |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1184h (NT) for 04/04/2019 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 2 |
2019-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/20/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-20 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0130h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0130h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0130h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 7 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 17 |