NH HB510 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state motor vehicle registration fees and funding for noise abatement projects.
Title
Relative to state motor vehicle registration fees and funding for noise abatement projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 13 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 23 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 18 |