NH HB511 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 259; Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to vaping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to vaping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 259; Eff: 07/01/2019
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2554c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Warden) 06/27/2019
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2554c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-19SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2554c; 06/27/2019
2019-06-18SenateConferee Change; Senator Soucy Replaces Senator Morse; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-17HouseConferee Change: Rep. Weber Replaces Rep. Freitas 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 20
2019-06-13HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Cavanaugh, Morse, Morgan; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Cavanaugh Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Marsh, Freitas, Knirk, Schapiro 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 44
2019-06-12HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1518s and Requests CofC (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 44
2019-04-25SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1518s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1518s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14
2019-04-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1518s, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-27SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0459h and 2019-0680h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 42
2019-03-07HouseFLAM # 2019-0680h (Rep. Weber): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 42
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0459h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 41
2019-02-28HouseSpecial Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62
2019-02-27HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Weber) 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 2
2019-02-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0459h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 11
2019-02-06House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-23House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-23HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback