NH HB513 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB513
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-05 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to allowing the use of therapy animals or facility dogs for therapeutic purposes in proceedings involving children or certain other persons.
Title
Relative to allowing the use of therapy animals or facility dogs for therapeutic purposes in proceedings involving children or certain other persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2710h (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) |
2019-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-08-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-07-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-06-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/25/2019 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-03-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB513 (Carry Over) 2019-11-05 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate